Case Last Refreshed: 2 months ago
Discover Bank, Jenkins, Robert E, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Elise D. Manchester, against Ross, Marsha L, in the jurisdiction of Smith County, TX, . Smith County, TX Superior Courts with Getz, Floyd T presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGetz, Floyd T Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 02, 2016 |
CategoryContract - Other |
Last RefreshedJanuary 31, 2024 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationSmith County, TX |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Case Outcome TypeDefault Judgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 30, 2024 | Docket Event |
OATH OF RECEIVER Notice |
|
January 23, 2024 | Docket Event |
MOTION TO APPOINT RECEIVER Motion |
|
January 23, 2024 | Docket Event |
ORDER APPOINTING RECEIVER Proposed Order |
|
February 21, 2017 | Docket Event | Notice of Default Judgment Mailed | |
February 21, 2017 | Docket Event |
66175-B Docket Sheet Docket Sheet |
|
February 09, 2017 | Docket Event | Motion for Default Judgment | |
December 07, 2016 | Docket Event | Citation Returned Served | |
December 02, 2016 | Docket Event |
COVER LETTER Letter |
|
December 02, 2016 | Docket Event |
CCI SHEET Civil Case Information Sheet |
|
December 02, 2016 | Docket Event | Citation Issued |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.