Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Brian Baber filed a(n) Issuance Of Letters case in the jurisdiction of Smith County, TX, . Smith County, TX Superior Courts with Clay M. White presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 14, 2023 |
CategoryIssuance Of Letters |
Last RefreshedNovember 18, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationSmith County, TX |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 11, 2023 | Docket Event | Letters Testamentary (1:45 PM) (Judicial Officer White, Clay) | |
November 16, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order Probating Will for Letters Testamentary - Proposed Order |
|
November 16, 2023 | Docket Event |
Oath - Proposed Miscellaneous |
|
November 16, 2023 | Docket Event |
Proof of Death and Other Facts - Proposed Proof of Death and Other Facts |
|
November 15, 2023 | Docket Event | Last Will and Testament | |
November 14, 2023 | Docket Event | Citation Howerton, Grace Laff Served 11/14/2023 | |
November 14, 2023 | Docket Event | Application for Letters Testamentary (OCA) | |
November 14, 2023 | Docket Event |
WILL Last Will and Testament |
|
November 14, 2023 | Docket Event | Citation Howerton, Grace Laff Unserved |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.