Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Smith County, Smith County Emergency Services District # 02, Whitehouse Independent School District, filed a(n) General Tax - Tax case represented by Jim Lambeth, against Bass, Gregory, N Homes Llc,, Remington Alarm Systems, Inc, in the jurisdiction of Smith County, TX, . Smith County, TX Superior Courts with Skeen, Jack, Jr. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 23, 2015 |
CategoryTax Cases |
Last RefreshedJanuary 27, 2024 |
Practice AreaTax |
Filing LocationSmith County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Tax |
Case Outcome TypeDefault Judgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 08, 2017 | Docket Event | Answer | |
July 20, 2017 | Docket Event | Default Judgment | |
July 20, 2017 | Docket Event | Tax Hearing (1:30 PM) (Judicial Officer Skeen, Jack, Jr.) Result: Hearing Held | |
July 18, 2017 | Docket Event |
24,962-C Cert LKMA Certificate of Last Known Address |
|
July 18, 2017 | Docket Event |
24,962-C Judgment Ltrs Notice of Judgment |
|
July 18, 2017 | Docket Event |
24,962-C Military Affidavit Affidavit of Non-Military Status |
|
May 17, 2016 | Docket Event | Citation Returned Unserved | |
April 26, 2016 | Docket Event | Citation Returned Served | |
April 25, 2016 | Docket Event | Citation Returned Served | |
April 13, 2016 | Docket Event | Citation Johnson, Kathrina Served 04/18/2016 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.