Case Last Refreshed: 9 hours ago
Navy Federal Credit Union, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Lori Miller, against Roach, Cindy, in the jurisdiction of Smith County, TX, . Smith County, TX Superior Courts 241st District Court with Debra E. Gunter presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 14, 2023 |
CategoryContract - Other |
Last RefreshedJuly 02, 2024 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationSmith County, TX |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Filing Court House241st District Court |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 02, 2024 | Docket Event |
Efile Service Confirmed - Order Dismissing for Want of Prosecution Efile Service Confirmed |
|
July 01, 2024 | Docket Event | Bench Trial (10:30 AM) (Judicial Officer Gunter, Debby) Result: Hearing Held | |
July 01, 2024 | Docket Event | Order Dismissing for Want of Prosecution | |
July 01, 2024 | Docket Event | Bench Trial (10:30 AM) (Judicial Officer Gunter, Debby) | |
May 29, 2024 | Docket Event |
EFILE SERVICE CONFIRMED - ORDER SETTING HEARING Efile Service Confirmed |
|
May 28, 2024 | Docket Event | Dismissal for Want of Prosecution (11:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Gunter, Debby) Result: Case Retained | |
May 28, 2024 | Docket Event | Order Setting Hearing | |
April 12, 2024 | Docket Event |
EFILE SERVICE CONFIRMED - ORDER SETTING DWOP HEARING Efile Service Confirmed |
|
April 10, 2024 | Docket Event |
Citation Request Request for Citation |
|
April 10, 2024 | Docket Event | Citation |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.