Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Bell, Tavion, filed a(n) Bill Of Review case in the jurisdiction of Smith County, TX, . Smith County, TX Superior Courts with Kerry L. Russell presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeKerry L. Russell Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 18, 2023 |
CategoryBill Of Review |
Last RefreshedSeptember 17, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationSmith County, TX |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 15, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order Setting Hearing Status Hearing (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Russell, Kerry L) Result: Hearing Held |
|
September 06, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice | |
September 05, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice | |
September 01, 2023 | Docket Event | Exhibits | |
September 01, 2023 | Docket Event | Order Setting Hearing | |
August 29, 2023 | Docket Event |
Exhibits 11-19 Exhibits |
|
August 28, 2023 | Docket Event | Docket Sheet | |
August 28, 2023 | Docket Event | Exhibits | |
August 22, 2023 | Docket Event | Exhibits | |
August 18, 2023 | Docket Event |
Proposed Findings of Fact & Conclusions Proposed Findings of Fact & Conclusions |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.