Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Nunes, Melinda, Nunes, Steven M, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Nunes, Frank Marvin, against Cottonwood Homes, Inc., Cottonwood Holdings, Llc, represented by Pazdernik, Michael Karl, in the jurisdiction of Napa County. This case was filed in Napa County Superior Courts with Francisca P. Tisher presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateJune 29, 2009 |
CategoryOther Pi/Pd/Wd Unlimited (23) |
Time To Trial714 days |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationNapa County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
|
Case Cycle Time749 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 18, 2011 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial 253110-Jury Trial; Nunes, S. et al. vs. Cottonwood Holdings, LLC ; Judge: J21160 Tisher Francisca P. Judge: Tisher, Francisca P. |
|
July 14, 2011 | Docket Event |
Conference: Trial Management 248110-Conference: Trial Management; Nunes, S. et al. vs. Cottonwood Holdings, LLC ; Judge: J21130 Guadagni Raymond A. Judge: Guadagni, Raymond A. |
|
July 12, 2011 | Docket Event |
Converted Stat Closure Disposition Date: Jul 12 2011 Type: 243110 - Entry of Request for Dismissal Manner : 241210 - Before Trial: No Sttlmnt Cnf/ADR |
|
July 12, 2011 | Docket Event |
Dismissal 233910-Dismissal Filed/Issued By: 931210 - Attorney for Plaintiff DISMISSAL [233910] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By ATTORNEY FOR PLAINTIFF [931210] |
|
July 05, 2011 | Docket Event |
Correspondence 212510-Correspondence Add'l Description: Re Settlement Filed/Issued By: 931210 - Attorney for Plaintiff CORRESPONDENCE [212510] Motion: Additional Description : RE SETTLEMENT Filed By ATTORNEY FOR PLAINTIFF [931210] |
|
July 01, 2011 | Docket Event |
Conference: Mandatory Settlement 244110-Conference: Settlement; Nunes, S. et al. vs. Cottonwood Holdings, LLC ; Judge: J21216 Byrne J. Michael Judge: Byrne, J. Michael |
|
June 27, 2011 | Docket Event |
Notice 212910-Notice Filed/Issued By: 931210 - Attorney for Plaintiff NOTICE [212910] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By ATTORNEY FOR PLAINTIFF [931210] |
|
June 13, 2011 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial 253110-Jury Trial; Nunes, S. et al. vs. Cottonwood Holdings, LLC ; Judge: J21160 Tisher Francisca P. Judge: Tisher, Francisca P. |
|
June 09, 2011 | Docket Event |
Conference: Trial Management 248110-Conference: Trial Management; Nunes, S. et al. vs. Cottonwood Holdings, LLC ; Judge: J21160 Tisher Francisca P. Judge: Tisher, Francisca P. |
|
June 03, 2011 | Docket Event |
Conference: Mandatory Settlement 244110-Conference: Settlement; Nunes, S. et al. vs. Cottonwood Holdings, LLC ; Judge: J21216 Byrne J. Michael Judge: Byrne, J. Michael |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.