Case Last Refreshed: 10 months ago
Crown Asset Management, Llc Assignee Of Santander Consumer Usa Inc., filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Roger Kyle Ball, against Genereaux, Denise, Zuniga, Cynthia, in the jurisdiction of Smith County, TX, . Smith County, TX Superior Courts with Russell, Kerry L presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 20, 2021 |
CategoryContract - Other |
Last RefreshedJuly 08, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationSmith County, TX |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Case Outcome TypeDismissed Without Prosecution |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 14, 2023 | Docket Event |
Bench Trial Case Disposed CANCELED Bench Trial (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Russell, Kerry L) Case Disposed Judge: Russell, Kerry L |
|
July 06, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order of Dismissal Order Dismissing for Want of Prosecution Judge: Russell, Kerry L |
|
July 06, 2023 | Docket Event |
Pre-Trial (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Russell, Kerry L) Result: Dismissed For Want of Prosecution
Judge: Russell, Kerry L |
|
June 27, 2023 | Docket Event |
Untitled Extract Pages Motion Judge: Russell, Kerry L |
|
January 30, 2023 | Docket Event |
Docket Control Order
Judge: Russell, Kerry L |
|
June 25, 2021 | Docket Event |
Lead_DefaultJudgmentMotion_eABC_filing_package Motion for Default Judgment Judge: Russell, Kerry L |
|
June 25, 2021 | Docket Event |
4267360_djl_eABC Notice Judge: Russell, Kerry L |
|
June 07, 2021 | Docket Event |
Original Answer
Judge: Russell, Kerry L |
|
May 26, 2021 | Docket Event |
Lead_Summons_eABC_filing_package Citation Returned Served Judge: Russell, Kerry L |
|
May 24, 2021 | Docket Event |
citation served to Denise Genereaux Citation Returned Served Judge: Russell, Kerry L |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.