Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Wayman, Brittani, Wayman, James Casey, filed a(n) Other Parent-Child - Family case against Ketley, Garrett Edwin, in the jurisdiction of Smith County, TX, . Smith County, TX Superior Courts with Robert H. Wilson presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRobert H. Wilson Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 01, 2021 |
CategoryTermination Of Parental Rights |
Last RefreshedJanuary 21, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationSmith County, TX |
Matter TypeOther Parent-Child |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 18, 2023 | Docket Event | Docket Sheet | |
January 18, 2023 | Docket Event | Temporary Order (1:30 PM) (Judicial Officer Wilson, Robert H.) | |
January 17, 2023 | Docket Event | Rule 11 Agreement | |
January 10, 2023 | Docket Event |
Motion to Modify Temporary Orders Motion to Modify |
|
January 04, 2023 | Docket Event |
10 Day Letter - Temporary Orders 10 Day Letter |
|
November 30, 2022 | Docket Event | Temporary Orders | |
November 16, 2022 | Docket Event |
10 Day Letter - Temporary Orders 10 Day Letter |
|
October 19, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order Appointing Amicus Attorney - Evan Barat Order Appointing Amicus Attorney |
|
October 17, 2022 | Docket Event |
Amended Order for Drug Screening Amended Order |
|
October 17, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Setting |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.