Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Dismissal For Want Of Prosecution filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case in the jurisdiction of Smith County, TX, . Smith County, TX Superior Courts with Robert H. Wilson presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRobert H. Wilson Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 09, 2021 |
CategoryDivorce - No Children |
Last RefreshedAugust 05, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationSmith County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Notice of Intent to Dismiss for Want of Prosecution
Date: April 09, 2021Statement of Inability to Pay Costs Approved
Date: May 13, 2020Statement of Inability to Pay
Date: May 12, 2020Pauper's Letter
Date: May 15, 2020Original Petition (OCA)
Date: May 12, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 15, 2021 | Docket Event | Dismissal for Want of Prosecution (8:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Wilson, Robert H.) | |
April 09, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Intent to Dismiss for Want of Prosecution | |
May 15, 2020 | Docket Event |
Pauper's Letter Pauper's Letter |
|
May 13, 2020 | Docket Event |
Statement of Inability to Pay Costs Approved Statement of Inability to Pay Costs Approved |
|
May 13, 2020 | Docket Event | Docket Sheet | |
May 12, 2020 | Docket Event | Statement of Inability to Pay | |
May 12, 2020 | Docket Event |
Original Petition for Divorce Original Petition (OCA) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.