Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Hernandez, Elvia Balderas, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Benitz, Jose Alberto Mendoza, in the jurisdiction of Smith County, TX, . Smith County, TX Superior Courts with Wilson, Robert H. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWilson, Robert H. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 27, 2020 |
CategoryDivorce - Children |
Last RefreshedDecember 12, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationSmith County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Case Outcome TypeNon-Suit |
Subpoena Duces Tecum Returned Served
Date: February 05, 2020Rule 11 Agreement
Date: February 04, 2020Citation Returned Served
Date: February 03, 2020TRO Returned
Date: February 03, 2020Order to Consolidate
Date: February 03, 2020Motion to Consolidate
Date: January 29, 2020Citation & TRO
Date: January 28, 2020Writ of Attachment
Date: January 28, 2020Order
Date: January 28, 2020Temporary Restraining Order Setting Hearing
Date: January 28, 2020Original Petition (OCA)
Date: January 27, 2020Motion for Continuance
Date: January 12, 2021Docket Sheet
Date: January 12, 2021Citation Returned Served
Date: December 30, 2020Notice Returned Served
Date: December 30, 2020Letter to the Judge
Date: December 14, 2020Original Answer
Date: December 10, 2020Citation & Notice
Date: December 03, 2020Order to Appear
Date: December 02, 2020Motion for Enforcement
Date: November 24, 2020Motion for Continuance
Date: November 16, 2020Temporary Orders
Date: August 18, 2020Notice of Setting
Date: August 06, 202010 Day Letter
Date: July 29, 2020Notice of Setting
Date: April 14, 2020Objections
Date: April 13, 202010 Day Letter
Date: April 01, 2020Writ of Attachment
Date: February 14, 2020Certificate of Written Discovery
Date: February 13, 2020Scheduling Order
Date: February 11, 2020Rule 11 Agreement
Date: February 11, 2020Subpoena Duces Tecum Returned Served
Date: February 10, 2020Notice of Setting
Date: January 12, 2021Order for Continuance
Date: January 12, 2021Notice of Setting
Date: February 23, 2022Subpoena Duces Tecum Returned Served
Date: June 23, 2021Subpoena Returned Served
Date: June 18, 2021Motion for Continuance
Date: June 18, 2021Motion
Date: June 18, 2021Notice of Setting
Date: May 18, 2021Motion for Continuance
Date: May 17, 2021Notice of Setting
Date: January 14, 2021Amended Motion
Date: January 13, 2021Subpoena Duces Tecum Returned Served
Date: May 17, 2022Motion/Order
Date: June 18, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 18, 2022 | Docket Event | Docket Sheet | |
May 18, 2022 | Docket Event | Final Hearing (1:30 PM) (Judicial Officer Wilson, Robert H.) | |
May 17, 2022 | Docket Event |
Subpoena Duces Tecum Returned Served - Sonia Rodriguez Subpoena Duces Tecum Returned Served |
|
February 23, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice of Setting
Judge: Wilson, Robert H. |
|
June 23, 2021 | Docket Event |
Subpoena Duces Tecum Returned Served - Sonia Rodriguez Subpoena Duces Tecum Returned Served Judge: Wilson, Robert H. |
|
June 23, 2021 | Docket Event | Miscellaneous | |
June 22, 2021 | Docket Event |
Bench Trial (10:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Wilson, Robert H.)
Judge: Wilson, Robert H. |
|
June 18, 2021 | Docket Event |
Subpoena Returned Served - Maria Mendoza Subpoena Returned Served Judge: Wilson, Robert H. |
|
June 18, 2021 | Docket Event |
Motion for Continuance
Judge: Wilson, Robert H. |
|
June 18, 2021 | Docket Event |
Motion for Witnesses to Appear Via Zoom Motion Judge: Wilson, Robert H. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.