Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Case Disposed filed a(n) General Tax - Tax case in the jurisdiction of Smith County, TX, . Smith County, TX Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 09, 2002 |
CategoryTax Cases |
Last RefreshedJuly 11, 2023 |
Practice AreaTax |
Filing LocationSmith County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Tax |
Order
Date: April 28, 2003Original Petition (OCA)
Date: December 09, 2002Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 19, 2003 | Docket Event | Correspondence | |
December 02, 2003 | Docket Event | File Sent to Cotton Belt | |
December 02, 2003 | Docket Event | Notice Sent | |
November 25, 2003 | Docket Event | Certificate of Last Known Address | |
November 25, 2003 | Docket Event | Case Disposed | |
November 25, 2003 | Docket Event | Converted Event | |
November 25, 2003 | Docket Event | Default Judgment | |
November 25, 2003 | Docket Event | Certified Copy of Tax Record | |
October 17, 2003 | Docket Event | Correspondence | |
May 20, 2003 | Docket Event | Citation Returned Served |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.