Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Cade, Dorothy Marie filed a(n) Name Change - Family case in the jurisdiction of Smith County, TX, . Smith County, TX Superior Courts with Clark, Carole W presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 27, 2017 |
CategoryName Change Adult\Child |
Last RefreshedNovember 04, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationSmith County, TX |
Matter TypeName Change |
Case Outcome TypeAgreed Judgment |
Order Granting Name Change
Date: February 07, 2018Statement of Inability to Pay
Date: December 27, 2017Original Petition (OCA)
Date: December 27, 2017Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 08, 2018 | Docket Event |
Docket Sheet
Judge: Clark, Carole W |
|
February 07, 2018 | Docket Event |
Order Granting Name Change
Judge: Clark, Carole W |
|
February 07, 2018 | Docket Event |
Name Change Hearing (9:30 AM) (Judicial Officer Clark, Carole W)
Judge: Clark, Carole W |
|
January 25, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Setting
Judge: Clark, Carole W |
|
January 11, 2018 | Docket Event |
Pauper's Oath
Judge: Clark, Carole W |
|
January 11, 2018 | Docket Event |
Pauper's Oath Approved
Judge: Clark, Carole W |
|
December 27, 2017 | Docket Event |
Docket Sheet
Judge: Clark, Carole W |
|
December 27, 2017 | Docket Event |
scan0051 Statement of Inability to Pay Judge: Clark, Carole W |
|
December 27, 2017 | Docket Event |
Civil Case Information Sheet
Judge: Clark, Carole W |
|
December 27, 2017 | Docket Event |
scan0049 Original Petition (OCA) Judge: Clark, Carole W |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.