Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Calvillo, Silvia, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Miguel Cazarez, against Jagjeet S. Sidhu D B A Modern Truck Line, Rakesh, Puri, represented by Robert L. Ramey, in the jurisdiction of Smith County, TX, . Smith County, TX Superior Courts with Kennedy, Christi presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 15, 2017 |
CategoryInjury/Damage - Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedNovember 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSmith County, TX |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Case Outcome TypeDismissed |
Order of Dismissal
Date: May 11, 2019Settlement Agreement
Date: April 24, 2019Motion to Dismiss
Date: May 09, 2019Letter From 114th
Date: April 25, 2019Order Appointing Mediator
Date: April 10, 2019Designation Of Expert Witnesses
Date: April 08, 2019Designation Of Expert Witnesses
Date: March 19, 2019Motion In Limine
Date: March 11, 2019Letter From 114th
Date: March 19, 2019Scheduling Order
Date: March 18, 2019Request for Interpreter
Date: March 11, 2019Designation Of Expert Witnesses
Date: December 03, 2018Motion
Date: March 05, 2019Order for Continuance
Date: October 12, 2018Motion for Continuance
Date: September 25, 2018Designation Of Expert Witnesses
Date: August 14, 2018Vacation Letter
Date: May 15, 2018Amended Scheduling Order
Date: October 13, 2017Letter From 114th
Date: September 29, 2017Scheduling Order
Date: September 29, 2017Request
Date: August 14, 2017Letter From 114th
Date: August 29, 2017Original Answer
Date: August 14, 2017Original Petition (OCA)
Date: June 15, 2017Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 17, 2019 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial Hearing Not Needed CANCELED Jury Trial (8:30 AM) (Judicial Officer Kennedy, Christi) Hearing Not Needed Judge: Kennedy, Christi |
|
June 07, 2019 | Docket Event |
Pre-Trial Hearing Hearing Not Needed CANCELED Pre-Trial Hearing (8:30 AM) (Judicial Officer Kennedy, Christi) Hearing Not Needed Judge: Kennedy, Christi |
|
May 31, 2019 | Docket Event |
Reporter's Certification
Judge: Kennedy, Christi |
|
May 11, 2019 | Docket Event |
prop Order to Dismiss with Prejudice Order of Dismissal Judge: Kennedy, Christi |
|
May 09, 2019 | Docket Event |
Motion to Dismiss with Prejudice Motion to Dismiss Judge: Kennedy, Christi |
|
April 25, 2019 | Docket Event |
Settlement Letter Letter From 114th Judge: Kennedy, Christi |
|
April 24, 2019 | Docket Event |
Parties Joint Notice of Settlement Settlement Agreement Judge: Kennedy, Christi |
|
April 18, 2019 | Docket Event |
Fact Witness List
Judge: Kennedy, Christi |
|
April 10, 2019 | Docket Event |
Order Appointing Agreed Mediator Order Appointing Mediator Judge: Kennedy, Christi |
|
April 09, 2019 | Docket Event |
Appointment of Agreed Mediator
Judge: Kennedy, Christi |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.