Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Kincaide, Paige, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case represented by Sam George, against Kincaide, Timothy, in the jurisdiction of Smith County, TX, . Smith County, TX Superior Courts with Clark, Carole W presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 12, 2017 |
CategoryDivorce - No Children |
Last RefreshedNovember 06, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationSmith County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Case Outcome TypeAgreed Judgment |
Judgment Letter
Date: September 18, 2017Letter
Date: September 01, 2017Request
Date: August 16, 2017Letter
Date: August 16, 2017Notice of Intent to Dismiss for Want of Prosecution
Date: June 27, 2017Answer
Date: June 27, 2017Original Petition (OCA)
Date: June 12, 2017Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 18, 2017 | Docket Event |
Judgement Letter Judgment Letter Judge: Clark, Carole W |
|
September 18, 2017 | Docket Event |
Docket Sheet
Judge: Clark, Carole W |
|
September 15, 2017 | Docket Event |
Final Decree of Divorce
Judge: Clark, Carole W |
|
September 15, 2017 | Docket Event |
Motion to Enter Judgment (9:30 AM) (Judicial Officer Clark, Carole W)
Judge: Clark, Carole W |
|
September 01, 2017 | Docket Event |
Vital Statistics Form
Judge: Clark, Carole W |
|
September 01, 2017 | Docket Event |
MX-5141N_20170901_075459 Letter Judge: Clark, Carole W |
|
August 24, 2017 | Docket Event |
Notice of Setting
Judge: Clark, Carole W |
|
August 16, 2017 | Docket Event |
MOTION TO ENTER JUDGMENT Request Judge: Clark, Carole W |
|
August 16, 2017 | Docket Event |
COVER LETTER TO MOTION TO ENTER JUDGMENT Letter Judge: Clark, Carole W |
|
June 28, 2017 | Docket Event |
Docket Sheet
Judge: Clark, Carole W |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.