Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Matthews, Amy Jean, filed a(n) Judgment Enforcement - Creditor case against Harwell, Orville Ray, Jr., in the jurisdiction of Smith County, TX, . Smith County, TX Superior Courts with Clark, Carole W presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 16, 2019 |
CategoryEnforcement |
Last RefreshedMarch 02, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationSmith County, TX |
Matter TypeJudgment Enforcement |
Case Outcome TypeAgreed Judgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 27, 2023 | Docket Event |
ENFORCEMENT HEARING (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Wilson, Robert H.)
Judge: Clark, Carole W |
|
January 17, 2023 | Docket Event |
ENFORCEMENT HEARING (3:00 PM) (Judicial Officer Wilson, Robert H.)
Judge: Clark, Carole W |
|
January 17, 2023 | Docket Event |
Docket Sheet - Paperless
Judge: Clark, Carole W |
|
December 15, 2022 | Docket Event |
Dismissal for Want of Prosecution Hearing Not Needed CANCELED Dismissal for Want of Prosecution (8:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Wilson, Robert H.) Hearing Not Needed Judge: Clark, Carole W |
|
December 14, 2022 | Docket Event |
Motion to Retain Case on Docket
Judge: Clark, Carole W |
|
November 29, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice - Enforcement Notice Issued Judge: Clark, Carole W |
|
November 29, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order to Appear - Enforcement Order to Appear Judge: Clark, Carole W |
|
November 18, 2022 | Docket Event |
Request for Citation
Judge: Clark, Carole W |
|
November 17, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice of Intent to Dismiss for Want of Prosecution
Judge: Clark, Carole W |
|
July 07, 2020 | Docket Event |
ENFORCEMENT HEARING Other CANCELED ENFORCEMENT HEARING (11:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Wilson, Robert H.) Other Judge: Clark, Carole W |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.