Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Couey, Leigha Michelle, filed a(n) Custody,Visitation - Family case against Morrow, Joseph, in the jurisdiction of Smith County, TX, . Smith County, TX Superior Courts with Clark, Carole W presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeClark, Carole W Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 08, 2016 |
CategoryModify - Other |
Last RefreshedJuly 29, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationSmith County, TX |
Matter TypeCustody,Visitation |
Case Outcome TypeAgreed Judgment |
Order to Modify
Date: September 19, 2017Petition to Modify
Date: July 31, 2017Original Petition (OCA)
Date: December 08, 2016Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 19, 2017 | Docket Event |
Order to Modify
Judge: Clark, Carole W |
|
September 19, 2017 | Docket Event |
Docket Sheet
Judge: Clark, Carole W |
|
September 15, 2017 | Docket Event |
Motion To Modify (1:30 PM) (Judicial Officer Clark, Carole W)
Judge: Clark, Carole W |
|
August 17, 2017 | Docket Event |
Returned Mail
Judge: Clark, Carole W |
|
August 02, 2017 | Docket Event |
Notice of Setting
Judge: Clark, Carole W |
|
July 31, 2017 | Docket Event |
Petition to Modify
Judge: Clark, Carole W |
|
July 31, 2017 | Docket Event |
Waiver of Service
Judge: Clark, Carole W |
|
July 31, 2017 | Docket Event |
Civil Case Information Sheet
Judge: Clark, Carole W |
|
December 19, 2016 | Docket Event |
Child Support Review Order
Judge: Clark, Carole W |
|
December 08, 2016 | Docket Event |
AGREED Original Petition (OCA) Judge: Clark, Carole W |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.