Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Gomez, Daniel, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Gomez, Trinity Dawn, in the jurisdiction of Smith County, TX, . Smith County, TX Superior Courts with Clark, Carole W presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeClark, Carole W Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 30, 2016 |
CategoryDivorce - No Children |
Last RefreshedJuly 29, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationSmith County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Case Outcome TypeAgreed Judgment |
Original Petition (OCA)
Date: December 30, 2016Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 17, 2017 | Docket Event |
Final Decree of Divorce
Judge: Clark, Carole W |
|
November 17, 2017 | Docket Event |
Divorce (1:30 PM) (Judicial Officer Clark, Carole W)
Judge: Clark, Carole W |
|
September 27, 2017 | Docket Event |
Notice of Setting
Judge: Clark, Carole W |
|
July 19, 2017 | Docket Event |
Pro Se Information Form
Judge: Clark, Carole W |
|
March 10, 2017 | Docket Event |
Waiver of Service
Judge: Clark, Carole W |
|
December 30, 2016 | Docket Event |
Original Petition (OCA)
Judge: Clark, Carole W |
|
December 30, 2016 | Docket Event |
Civil Case Information Sheet
Judge: Clark, Carole W |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.