Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Dfps, filed a(n) Consolidated Case case against Perez, John Anthony, Ii, Perez, Misti Elizabeth, in the jurisdiction of Smith County, TX, . Smith County, TX Superior Courts with Clark, Carole W presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeClark, Carole W Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 27, 2016 |
CategoryConsolidated Case |
Last RefreshedJuly 29, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationSmith County, TX |
|
Case Outcome TypeConsolidated |
Order to Consolidate
Date: March 14, 2017Motion to Consolidate
Date: March 13, 2017Order For Drug Testing
Date: March 09, 2017Motion/Order
Date: February 24, 2017Scheduling Order
Date: February 24, 2017Request
Date: February 06, 2017Request
Date: December 27, 2016Original Petition (OCA)
Date: December 27, 2016Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 19, 2017 | Docket Event |
Docket Sheet
Judge: Clark, Carole W |
|
March 14, 2017 | Docket Event |
Order to Consolidate
Judge: Clark, Carole W |
|
March 14, 2017 | Docket Event |
Temporary Orders
Judge: Clark, Carole W |
|
March 14, 2017 | Docket Event |
Status Report
Judge: Clark, Carole W |
|
March 13, 2017 | Docket Event |
Motion to Consolidate
Judge: Clark, Carole W |
|
March 13, 2017 | Docket Event |
Docket Sheet
Judge: Clark, Carole W |
|
March 09, 2017 | Docket Event |
Order For Drug Testing
Judge: Clark, Carole W |
|
March 09, 2017 | Docket Event |
Adversary Hearing (1:30 PM) (Judicial Officer Clark, Carole W)
Judge: Clark, Carole W |
|
March 08, 2017 | Docket Event |
Kinship Caregiver Home Assessments
Judge: Clark, Carole W |
|
March 08, 2017 | Docket Event |
Notification Regarding Consent for Medical Care
Judge: Clark, Carole W |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.