Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Dfps, filed a(n) Child Protection - Family case against Glass, Robert Gordon, Mccrea, Jennifer Elizabeth, in the jurisdiction of Smith County, TX, . Smith County, TX Superior Courts with Clark, Carole W presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeClark, Carole W Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 16, 2016 |
CategoryChild Protective Services |
Last RefreshedOctober 10, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationSmith County, TX |
Matter TypeChild Protection |
Case Outcome TypeAgreed Judgment |
Order
Date: August 03, 2018Order
Date: March 07, 2018Request for Setting
Date: February 22, 2018Amended Answer
Date: December 12, 2017Order Appointing Attorney Ad Litem
Date: November 21, 2017Request for Setting
Date: October 16, 2017Order to Withdraw as Counsel
Date: October 26, 2017Motion to Withdraw as Counsel
Date: October 12, 2017Motion
Date: September 28, 2017Order
Date: September 28, 2017Order
Date: March 16, 2017Original Answer
Date: January 25, 2017Order
Date: January 11, 2017Order Appointing Attorney Ad Litem
Date: January 11, 2017Original Answer
Date: January 09, 2017Court of Continuing Jurisdiction
Date: December 27, 2016Order
Date: December 19, 2016Scheduling Order
Date: December 16, 2016Original Petition (OCA)
Date: December 16, 2016Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 30, 2018 | Docket Event |
Docket Sheet
Judge: Clark, Carole W |
|
October 25, 2018 | Docket Event |
Order In Suit Affecting the Parent-Child Relationship
Judge: Clark, Carole W |
|
October 25, 2018 | Docket Event |
Trial (10:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Clark, Carole W)
Judge: Clark, Carole W |
|
October 24, 2018 | Docket Event |
Docket Sheet
Judge: Clark, Carole W |
|
October 23, 2018 | Docket Event |
Trial (9:30 AM) (Judicial Officer Clark, Carole W)
Judge: Clark, Carole W |
|
August 21, 2018 | Docket Event |
Permanency Hearing Order
Judge: Clark, Carole W |
|
August 14, 2018 | Docket Event |
Docket Sheet
Judge: Clark, Carole W |
|
August 09, 2018 | Docket Event |
Permanency Hearing (11:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Clark, Carole W)
Judge: Clark, Carole W |
|
August 03, 2018 | Docket Event |
Order
Judge: Clark, Carole W |
|
July 30, 2018 | Docket Event |
Permanency Report To the Court
Judge: Clark, Carole W |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.