Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Jensen, Cindy, Jensen, Doug, filed a(n) Civil Case - Other case against Trent Williams Construction Management, Llc, represented by G. Blake Thompson, in the jurisdiction of Smith County, TX, . Smith County, TX Superior Courts with Skeen, Jack, Jr. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSkeen, Jack, Jr. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 14, 2016 |
CategoryCivil Case - Other |
Last RefreshedNovember 07, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationSmith County, TX |
|
Case Outcome TypeDismissed |
Motion
Date: February 06, 2018Order of Dismissal
Date: July 19, 2018Motion
Date: July 13, 2018Order to Withdraw as Counsel
Date: May 22, 2018Scheduling Order
Date: March 23, 2017Motion
Date: May 15, 2018Rule 11 Agreement
Date: September 26, 2017Scheduling Order
Date: March 27, 2018Answer
Date: January 19, 2017Notice of Intent to Dismiss for Want of Prosecution
Date: December 20, 2017Original Petition (OCA)
Date: December 14, 2016Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 23, 2018 | Docket Event |
Docket Sheet
Judge: Skeen, Jack, Jr. |
|
July 19, 2018 | Docket Event |
Order of Dismissal
Judge: Skeen, Jack, Jr. |
|
July 19, 2018 | Docket Event |
Case Disposed CANCELED Bench Trial (8:30 AM) (Judicial Officer Skeen, Jack, Jr.) Case Disposed Judge: Skeen, Jack, Jr. |
|
July 13, 2018 | Docket Event |
Agreed Motion to Dismiss Motion Judge: Skeen, Jack, Jr. |
|
May 22, 2018 | Docket Event |
Order to Withdraw as Counsel
Judge: Skeen, Jack, Jr. |
|
May 15, 2018 | Docket Event |
jensen mtw Motion Judge: Skeen, Jack, Jr. |
|
March 27, 2018 | Docket Event |
Scheduling Order
Judge: Skeen, Jack, Jr. |
|
February 22, 2018 | Docket Event |
Dismissal for Want of Prosecution (1:30 PM) (Judicial Officer Skeen, Jack, Jr.)
Judge: Skeen, Jack, Jr. |
|
February 06, 2018 | Docket Event |
Mot to Retain Motion Judge: Skeen, Jack, Jr. |
|
December 20, 2017 | Docket Event |
Notice of Intent to Dimiss for Want of Prosecution Notice of Intent to Dismiss for Want of Prosecution Judge: Skeen, Jack, Jr. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.