Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Powell, Patsy Smith, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Powell, Jerry Tom, in the jurisdiction of Smith County, TX, . Smith County, TX Superior Courts with Clark, Carole W presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeClark, Carole W Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 01, 2016 |
CategoryDivorce - No Children |
Last RefreshedNovember 07, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationSmith County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Case Outcome TypeDismissed Without Prosecution |
Order
Date: February 27, 2017Motion
Date: February 16, 2017Request for Setting
Date: February 07, 2017Original Answer
Date: December 15, 2016Scheduling Order
Date: January 10, 2017Counter Petition
Date: January 06, 2017Original Petition (OCA)
Date: December 01, 2016Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 02, 2017 | Docket Event |
Docket Sheet
Judge: Clark, Carole W |
|
February 27, 2017 | Docket Event |
Order
Judge: Clark, Carole W |
|
February 16, 2017 | Docket Event |
jt mtn dismiss_20170216172822 Motion Judge: Clark, Carole W |
|
February 07, 2017 | Docket Event |
Request for Setting
Judge: Clark, Carole W |
|
January 10, 2017 | Docket Event |
Scheduling Order
Judge: Clark, Carole W |
|
January 06, 2017 | Docket Event |
POWELL COUNTER PET_20170106151608 Counter Petition Judge: Clark, Carole W |
|
December 16, 2016 | Docket Event |
Temporary Order (9:30 AM) (Judicial Officer Clark, Carole W)
Judge: Clark, Carole W |
|
December 15, 2016 | Docket Event |
RESP. ORIGINAL ANSWER Original Answer Judge: Clark, Carole W |
|
December 13, 2016 | Docket Event |
Notice Returned Served
Judge: Clark, Carole W |
|
December 13, 2016 | Docket Event |
Citation Returned Served
Judge: Clark, Carole W |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.