Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Citation filed a(n) Other Parent-Child - Family case in the jurisdiction of Smith County, TX, . Smith County, TX Superior Courts with Carole W. Clark presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 27, 2015 |
CategoryAg Parent Child Relationship |
Last RefreshedNovember 13, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationSmith County, TX |
Matter TypeOther Parent-Child |
Scheduling Order
Date: August 25, 2015Motion
Date: June 17, 2015Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 31, 2015 | Docket Event | Clerks Certificate of Transfer of Case | |
December 09, 2015 | Docket Event | Docket Sheet | |
December 08, 2015 | Docket Event | Order of Transfer | |
December 08, 2015 | Docket Event | Final Hearing (9:30 AM) (Judicial Officer Clark, Carole W) | |
December 07, 2015 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing | |
November 04, 2015 | Docket Event | Notice of Setting | |
November 04, 2015 | Docket Event | Pre-Trial Hearing (9:30 AM) (Judicial Officer Clark, Carole W) | |
October 09, 2015 | Docket Event | Other | |
September 14, 2015 | Docket Event | Appearance | |
August 25, 2015 | Docket Event | Scheduling Order |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.