Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Citation filed a(n) Modify - Custody case in the jurisdiction of Smith County, TX, . Smith County, TX Superior Courts with Robert H. Wilson presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 10, 2015 |
CategoryModify - Custody |
Last RefreshedJuly 31, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationSmith County, TX |
|
Order Terminating Order for Withholding
Date: July 30, 2021Petition to Modify
Date: June 28, 2021Order
Date: June 03, 2019Petition
Date: April 18, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 30, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order to Employer to Terminate Withholding for Support Order Terminating Order for Withholding |
|
July 30, 2021 | Docket Event | Certificate of Call for Defendant to Appear | |
July 30, 2021 | Docket Event | Motion To Modify (11:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Wilson, Robert H.) | |
July 13, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Setting | |
July 09, 2021 | Docket Event | Citation Returned Served | |
June 29, 2021 | Docket Event | Citation | |
June 29, 2021 | Docket Event | Citation HARVEY, MEOSHIA MASHAY Served 07/07/2021 | |
June 28, 2021 | Docket Event |
Petition to Modify PCR Petition to Modify |
|
June 03, 2019 | Docket Event | Order | |
June 03, 2019 | Docket Event | Docket Sheet |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.