Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Texas Department Of Human Services, filed a(n) Consolidated Case case against Gatewood, Derrick, Warren, Michelle, Williams, James, in the jurisdiction of Smith County, TX, . Smith County, TX Superior Courts with Clark, Carole W presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeClark, Carole W Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 30, 2015 |
CategoryConsolidated Case |
Last RefreshedNovember 07, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationSmith County, TX |
|
Case Outcome TypeConsolidated |
Order to Consolidate
Date: January 27, 2016Order of Nonsuit
Date: January 27, 2016Order
Date: January 27, 2016Counter Petition
Date: January 20, 2016Order
Date: January 21, 2016Original Answer
Date: January 18, 2016Counter Petition
Date: January 18, 2016Order
Date: January 14, 2016Statutory Written Statement
Date: January 14, 2016Order Appointing Attorney Ad Litem
Date: January 14, 2016Order Substituting Counsel
Date: January 14, 2016Order Transferring
Date: January 14, 2016Order
Date: January 07, 2016Motion
Date: January 12, 2016Statutory Written Statement
Date: January 07, 2016Scheduling Order
Date: January 04, 2016Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 09, 2016 | Docket Event |
Miscellaneous
Judge: Clark, Carole W |
|
February 04, 2016 | Docket Event |
Adversary Hearing (1:30 PM) (Judicial Officer Clark, Carole W)
Judge: Clark, Carole W |
|
February 01, 2016 | Docket Event |
Notice of Filing
Judge: Clark, Carole W |
|
February 01, 2016 | Docket Event |
Certificate
Judge: Clark, Carole W |
|
January 27, 2016 | Docket Event |
Order to Consolidate
Judge: Clark, Carole W |
|
January 27, 2016 | Docket Event |
Order of Nonsuit
Judge: Clark, Carole W |
|
January 27, 2016 | Docket Event |
Order
Judge: Clark, Carole W |
|
January 25, 2016 | Docket Event |
Docket Sheet
Judge: Clark, Carole W |
|
January 22, 2016 | Docket Event |
Notice of Non-Suit
Judge: Clark, Carole W |
|
January 21, 2016 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing
Judge: Clark, Carole W |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.