Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Lacy, Michael Damon, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Lacy, Ramonia Gail, in the jurisdiction of Smith County, TX, . Smith County, TX Superior Courts with Clark, Carole W presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeClark, Carole W Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 17, 2015 |
CategoryDivorce - No Children |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationSmith County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Case Outcome TypeDismissed Without Prosecution |
Order of Dismissal
Date: February 16, 2018Request for Setting
Date: May 01, 2017Request
Date: February 22, 2016Letter
Date: December 21, 2015Statement of Inability to Pay Costs Approved
Date: December 18, 2015Statement of Inability to Pay
Date: December 17, 2015Original Petition (OCA)
Date: December 17, 2015Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 22, 2018 | Docket Event |
Docket Sheet
Judge: Clark, Carole W |
|
February 16, 2018 | Docket Event |
Order of Dismissal
Judge: Clark, Carole W |
|
February 16, 2018 | Docket Event |
Divorce (1:30 PM) (Judicial Officer Clark, Carole W)
Judge: Clark, Carole W |
|
February 15, 2018 | Docket Event |
Order Setting Hearing
Judge: Clark, Carole W |
|
January 22, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Setting
Judge: Clark, Carole W |
|
May 01, 2017 | Docket Event |
Request for Setting
Judge: Clark, Carole W |
|
March 15, 2016 | Docket Event |
Citation Returned Served
Judge: Clark, Carole W |
|
February 25, 2016 | Docket Event |
Citation
Judge: Clark, Carole W |
|
February 25, 2016 | Docket Event |
Citation LACY, RAMONIA GAIL Served 03/02/2016
Judge: Clark, Carole W |
|
February 22, 2016 | Docket Event |
Request
Judge: Clark, Carole W |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.