Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Chessum, Bernard Kosgei, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Sheffie, Latrisha Rhondnetta, in the jurisdiction of Smith County, TX, . Smith County, TX Superior Courts with Clark, Carole W presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeClark, Carole W Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 17, 2015 |
CategoryDivorce - Children |
Last RefreshedJuly 29, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationSmith County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Case Outcome TypeFinal Decree |
Letter
Date: July 12, 2017Notice of Intent to Dismiss for Want of Prosecution
Date: June 27, 2017Order to Consolidate
Date: May 26, 2017Letter
Date: May 23, 2017Request
Date: May 01, 2017Notice of Intent to Dismiss for Want of Prosecution
Date: February 01, 2017Original Petition (OCA)
Date: December 17, 2015Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 20, 2017 | Docket Event |
Docket Sheet
Judge: Clark, Carole W |
|
July 16, 2017 | Docket Event |
Final Decree of Divorce
Judge: Clark, Carole W |
|
July 12, 2017 | Docket Event |
10-day letter to parties Letter Judge: Clark, Carole W |
|
June 28, 2017 | Docket Event |
Docket Sheet
Judge: Clark, Carole W |
|
June 27, 2017 | Docket Event |
Notice of Intent to Dimiss for Want of Prosecution Notice of Intent to Dismiss for Want of Prosecution Judge: Clark, Carole W |
|
June 20, 2017 | Docket Event |
Motion to Enter Judgment (1:30 PM) (Judicial Officer Clark, Carole W)
Judge: Clark, Carole W |
|
June 02, 2017 | Docket Event |
Docket Sheet
Judge: Clark, Carole W |
|
May 31, 2017 | Docket Event |
Citation Returned Served
Judge: Clark, Carole W |
|
May 26, 2017 | Docket Event |
Order to Consolidate
Judge: Clark, Carole W |
|
May 23, 2017 | Docket Event |
Letter
Judge: Clark, Carole W |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.