Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Salas Allen, Mary, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case represented by Joe B. Beam, against Allen, Charles Reginald, Ii, in the jurisdiction of Smith County, TX, . Smith County, TX Superior Courts with Wilson, Robert H. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 31, 2015 |
CategoryDivorce - No Children |
Last RefreshedJuly 29, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationSmith County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Case Outcome TypeFinal Decree |
Original Petition (OCA)
Date: March 31, 2015Order
Date: September 20, 2019Judgment Letter
Date: September 13, 2019Answer
Date: July 31, 2019Amended Motion
Date: July 23, 2019Letter
Date: July 08, 2019Notice of Intent to Dismiss for Want of Prosecution
Date: May 30, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 20, 2019 | Docket Event |
Order
Judge: Wilson, Robert H. |
|
September 13, 2019 | Docket Event |
Judgment Letter
Judge: Wilson, Robert H. |
|
September 11, 2019 | Docket Event |
Docket Sheet
Judge: Wilson, Robert H. |
|
September 11, 2019 | Docket Event |
Final Decree of Divorce
Judge: Wilson, Robert H. |
|
September 11, 2019 | Docket Event |
Prove Up Hearing (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Wilson, Robert H.) 07/15/2019 Reset by Court to 08/15/2019 08/15/2019 Reset by Court to 09/11/2019
Judge: Wilson, Robert H. |
|
August 09, 2019 | Docket Event |
Notice of Setting
Judge: Wilson, Robert H. |
|
August 07, 2019 | Docket Event |
Citation Returned Served
Judge: Wilson, Robert H. |
|
July 31, 2019 | Docket Event |
Answer
Judge: Wilson, Robert H. |
|
July 23, 2019 | Docket Event |
Citation
Judge: Wilson, Robert H. |
|
July 23, 2019 | Docket Event |
Petitioner's Amended Original Petition for Divorce Amended Motion Judge: Wilson, Robert H. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.