Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Shanklin, Tracey Kathleen, filed a(n) Custody,Visitation - Family case represented by James Andrew Carter, against Shanklin, Daniel Curtis, represented by William H. Lively, in the jurisdiction of Smith County, TX, . Smith County, TX Superior Courts with Clark, Carole W presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 27, 2015 |
CategoryModify - Other |
Last RefreshedNovember 08, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationSmith County, TX |
Matter TypeCustody,Visitation |
Case Outcome TypeDismissed Without Prosecution |
Motion to Modify
Date: October 17, 2017Amended Motion
Date: June 23, 2015Order of Dismissal
Date: May 11, 2018Notice of Intent to Dismiss for Want of Prosecution
Date: December 12, 2017Nunc Pro Tunc Order
Date: August 12, 2016Motion
Date: July 25, 2016Amended Motion
Date: June 24, 2015Original Answer
Date: July 15, 2015Scheduling Order
Date: August 26, 2015Original Petition (OCA)
Date: March 27, 2015Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 18, 2018 | Docket Event |
Docket Sheet
Judge: Clark, Carole W |
|
May 11, 2018 | Docket Event |
Order of Dismissal
Judge: Clark, Carole W |
|
December 13, 2017 | Docket Event |
Docket Sheet
Judge: Clark, Carole W |
|
December 12, 2017 | Docket Event |
Notice of Intent to Dimiss for Want of Prosecution Notice of Intent to Dismiss for Want of Prosecution Judge: Clark, Carole W |
|
December 12, 2017 | Docket Event |
Motion to Enter Judgment (9:30 AM) (Judicial Officer Clark, Carole W)
Judge: Clark, Carole W |
|
November 27, 2017 | Docket Event |
Docket Sheet
Judge: Clark, Carole W |
|
November 21, 2017 | Docket Event |
Notice of Setting
Judge: Clark, Carole W |
|
November 21, 2017 | Docket Event |
TRO Hearing (9:30 AM) (Judicial Officer Clark, Carole W)
Judge: Clark, Carole W |
|
November 14, 2017 | Docket Event |
Docket Sheet
Judge: Clark, Carole W |
|
November 07, 2017 | Docket Event |
Notice of Setting
Judge: Clark, Carole W |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.