Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Kendrick, Mark Dewitt, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Kendrick, Ann Renee, in the jurisdiction of Smith County, TX, . Smith County, TX Superior Courts with Clark, Carole W presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 26, 2015 |
CategoryDivorce - No Children |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationSmith County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Case Outcome TypeFinal Decree |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 01, 2015 | Docket Event |
Letter
Judge: Clark, Carole W |
|
September 01, 2015 | Docket Event |
Docket Sheet
Judge: Clark, Carole W |
|
August 28, 2015 | Docket Event |
Final Decree of Divorce
Judge: Clark, Carole W |
|
August 28, 2015 | Docket Event |
Divorce (1:30 PM) (Judicial Officer Clark, Carole W)
Judge: Clark, Carole W |
|
July 13, 2015 | Docket Event |
Notice of Setting
Judge: Clark, Carole W |
|
April 22, 2015 | Docket Event |
Pro Se Information Form
Judge: Clark, Carole W |
|
March 26, 2015 | Docket Event |
Waiver of Service
Judge: Clark, Carole W |
|
March 26, 2015 | Docket Event |
Civil Case Information Sheet
Judge: Clark, Carole W |
|
March 26, 2015 | Docket Event |
Original Petition (OCA)
Judge: Clark, Carole W |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.