Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Bower, Mindie Roxanne, filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case against Williams, John, Sampson, Lisa, Cisco, Bobby, Bragg, Jeff, Austin Bank, (total of 5) See All in the jurisdiction of Smith County, TX, . Smith County, TX Superior Courts with Jack Skeen, Jr. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 09, 2015 |
CategoryInjury/Damage - Other |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSmith County, TX |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
Case Outcome TypeDismissed |
Dismissed for Want of Prosecution
Date: March 30, 2017Original Petition (OCA)
Date: March 09, 2015Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 03, 2017 | Docket Event | Docket Sheet | |
March 30, 2017 | Docket Event | Dismissed for Want of Prosecution | |
March 30, 2017 | Docket Event | Dismissal for Want of Prosecution (1:30 PM) (Judicial Officer Skeen, Jack, Jr.) | |
January 17, 2017 | Docket Event | Returned Mail | |
January 11, 2017 | Docket Event | Notice | |
March 09, 2015 | Docket Event |
DISTRICT COURT OF SMITH COUNTY TEXAS Original Petition (OCA) |
|
March 09, 2015 | Docket Event | Civil Case Information Sheet |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.