Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Case Disposed filed a(n) Civil Case - Other case in the jurisdiction of Smith County, TX, . Smith County, TX Superior Courts with Christi Kennedy presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 28, 2013 |
CategoryCivil Case - Other |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationSmith County, TX |
|
Request
Date: June 10, 2016Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 08, 2017 | Docket Event | Certificate of Destruction | |
June 13, 2016 | Docket Event | Writ of Execution | |
June 10, 2016 | Docket Event |
2016-06-10 - Clerk req issuance of another writ of execution Request |
|
April 21, 2015 | Docket Event | Certificate | |
July 24, 2014 | Docket Event | Writ of Execution Returned | |
April 08, 2014 | Docket Event | File Sent to Cotton Belt | |
March 28, 2014 | Docket Event | Writ of Execution | |
February 18, 2014 | Docket Event | Exhibit List | |
January 29, 2014 | Docket Event | Civil Joint Questionnaire (8:30 AM) (Judicial Officer Kennedy, Christi) Result: Hearing Not Needed | |
January 10, 2014 | Docket Event | Docket Sheet |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.