Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Case Disposed filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case in the jurisdiction of Smith County, TX, . Smith County, TX Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 30, 2003 |
CategoryParent-Child Relationship - No Divorce |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationSmith County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 06, 2005 | Docket Event | Income Withholding for Support Sent to Employer | |
September 16, 2005 | Docket Event | Order to Modify | |
September 16, 2005 | Docket Event | Case Disposed | |
September 16, 2005 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing Foreign Judgment | |
August 25, 2005 | Docket Event | Dismissal for Want of Prosecution (9:30 AM) (Judicial Officer Dunn, Thomas) Result: Case Disposed | |
May 20, 2004 | Docket Event | Motion to Compel (9:30 AM) (Judicial Officer Dunn, Thomas) | |
May 12, 2004 | Docket Event | Motion to Compel (9:30 AM) (Judicial Officer Dunn, Thomas) Result: Rescheduled | |
May 12, 2004 | Docket Event | Hearing (9:30 AM) (Judicial Officer Dunn, Thomas) | |
May 12, 2004 | Docket Event | Notice of Setting | |
May 03, 2004 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.