Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
3Rd Amended Plaintiff'S Original Petition filed a(n) Civil Case - Other case in the jurisdiction of Smith County, TX, . Smith County, TX Superior Courts with Jack Skeen, Jr. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 09, 2003 |
CategoryCivil Case - Other |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationSmith County, TX |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 19, 2018 | Docket Event | Certificate of Destruction | |
March 15, 2010 | Docket Event | INCOMING/OUTGOING FAXES | |
June 30, 2009 | Docket Event |
APPEAL: MANDATE Appeal Mandate - Closed |
|
June 08, 2009 | Docket Event | Other | |
May 19, 2009 | Docket Event | Writ of Execution Returned | |
April 15, 2009 | Docket Event | Important Info | |
March 20, 2009 | Docket Event | Clerks Records Returned | |
March 13, 2009 | Docket Event | Other | |
March 05, 2009 | Docket Event | Other | |
March 05, 2009 | Docket Event | Important Info |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.