Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Boyd, Wesley Joe, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Boyd, Cassie Fields, in the jurisdiction of Smith County, TX, . Smith County, TX Superior Courts with Clark, Carole W presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 03, 2003 |
CategoryDivorce - Children |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationSmith County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Case Outcome TypeAgreed Judgment |
Order for Continuance
Date: February 12, 2004Scheduling Order
Date: January 09, 2004Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 31, 2004 | Docket Event |
Case Disposed
Judge: Clark, Carole W Converted Disposition:Party: BOYD, CASSIE FIELDS Disposition: AGREED JUDGMENT Judgment : Agreed |
|
August 27, 2004 | Docket Event |
Final Decree of Divorce
Judge: Clark, Carole W Converted Disposition:Party: BOYD, CASSIE FIELDS Disposition: AGREED JUDGMENT Judgment : Agreed |
|
August 27, 2004 | Docket Event |
Income Withholding for Support
Judge: Clark, Carole W Converted Disposition:Party: BOYD, CASSIE FIELDS Disposition: AGREED JUDGMENT Judgment : Agreed |
|
August 27, 2004 | Docket Event |
Medical Child Support Order
Judge: Clark, Carole W Converted Disposition:Party: BOYD, CASSIE FIELDS Disposition: AGREED JUDGMENT Judgment : Agreed |
|
August 17, 2004 | Docket Event |
Letter to the Judge
Judge: Clark, Carole W Converted Disposition:Party: BOYD, CASSIE FIELDS Disposition: AGREED JUDGMENT Judgment : Agreed |
|
August 16, 2004 | Docket Event |
Dismissal for Want of Prosecution (8:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Clark, Carole W)
Judge: Clark, Carole W Converted Disposition:Party: BOYD, CASSIE FIELDS Disposition: AGREED JUDGMENT Judgment : Agreed |
|
May 18, 2004 | Docket Event |
Kids First/ Parenting Class
Judge: Clark, Carole W Converted Disposition:Party: BOYD, CASSIE FIELDS Disposition: AGREED JUDGMENT Judgment : Agreed |
|
May 18, 2004 | Docket Event |
Trial (8:30 AM) (Judicial Officer Clark, Carole W)
Judge: Clark, Carole W Converted Disposition:Party: BOYD, CASSIE FIELDS Disposition: AGREED JUDGMENT Judgment : Agreed |
|
May 18, 2004 | Docket Event |
Mediated Settlement Agreement
Judge: Clark, Carole W Converted Disposition:Party: BOYD, CASSIE FIELDS Disposition: AGREED JUDGMENT Judgment : Agreed |
|
May 10, 2004 | Docket Event |
Notice of Filing
Judge: Clark, Carole W Converted Disposition:Party: BOYD, CASSIE FIELDS Disposition: AGREED JUDGMENT Judgment : Agreed |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.