Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Attorney General filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case in the jurisdiction of Smith County, TX, . Smith County, TX Superior Courts with Clark, Carole W presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeClark, Carole W Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 28, 2001 |
CategoryParent-Child Relationship - No Divorce |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationSmith County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Case Outcome TypeAgreed Judgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 07, 2002 | Docket Event |
Waiver
Judge: Clark, Carole W Converted Disposition:Party: PARRISH, RACHELLE Disposition: AGREED JUDGMENT |
|
January 28, 2002 | Docket Event |
Order Vol./Book 399, Page 486-502 Vol./Book 399, Page 486-502 Judge: Clark, Carole W Converted Disposition:Party: PARRISH, RACHELLE Disposition: AGREED JUDGMENT |
|
January 28, 2002 | Docket Event |
Case Disposed
Judge: Clark, Carole W Converted Disposition:Party: PARRISH, RACHELLE Disposition: AGREED JUDGMENT |
|
December 28, 2001 | Docket Event |
Citation PARRISH, RACHELLE Returned Unserved 01/04/2002 Returned 01/04/2002
Judge: Clark, Carole W Converted Disposition:Party: PARRISH, RACHELLE Disposition: AGREED JUDGMENT |
|
December 28, 2001 | Docket Event |
Citation
Judge: Clark, Carole W Converted Disposition:Party: PARRISH, RACHELLE Disposition: AGREED JUDGMENT |
|
December 28, 2001 | Docket Event |
Citation MOLINA, MIKE Served 01/03/2002 Response Due 01/28/2002
Judge: Clark, Carole W Converted Disposition:Party: PARRISH, RACHELLE Disposition: AGREED JUDGMENT |
|
December 28, 2001 | Docket Event |
Paternity (OCA)
Judge: Clark, Carole W Converted Disposition:Party: PARRISH, RACHELLE Disposition: AGREED JUDGMENT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.