Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Mcclure, Lee Bertha filed a(n) Guardianship,Conservatorship - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Rockwall County, TX, . Rockwall County, TX Superior Courts County Court at Law 1 with Bell, Bill presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 07, 1992 |
CategoryGuardianship Of An Adult |
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationRockwall County, TX |
Matter TypeGuardianship,Conservatorship |
Filing Court HouseCounty Court at Law 1 |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 04, 2007 | Docket Event | Order | |
October 04, 2007 | Docket Event | $DISP | |
October 04, 2007 | Docket Event | Disposed | |
September 26, 2007 | Docket Event | Docket Call | |
September 06, 2007 | Docket Event | LETTER FROM JUDGE | |
December 07, 1992 | Docket Event | 12/07/1992 COMPLETE CASE | |
December 07, 1992 | Docket Event | 12/07/1992 Case Filed |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.