Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Briggs, Brenda Kay filed a(n) Estate Administration - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Rockwall County, TX, . Rockwall County, TX Superior Courts County Court at Law 1 with Williams, J. Brian presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWilliams, J. Brian Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 30, 2019 |
CategoryLetters Of Testamentary |
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationRockwall County, TX |
Matter TypeEstate Administration |
Filing Court HouseCounty Court at Law 1 |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 21, 2020 | Docket Event | Request | |
May 08, 2020 | Docket Event | Request | |
May 08, 2020 | Docket Event | Order | |
May 07, 2020 | Docket Event | Motion | |
April 24, 2020 | Docket Event | Coordinator Status Check | |
April 22, 2020 | Docket Event | INVENTORY & APPRAISE | |
April 22, 2020 | Docket Event | ORDER APPROVING INVENTORY | |
April 22, 2020 | Docket Event | Certificate | |
January 31, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice | |
January 23, 2020 | Docket Event | Oath |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.