Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Lofland, William B. filed a(n) Estate Administration - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Rockwall County, TX, . Rockwall County, TX Superior Courts County Court at Law 1 with Williams, J. Brian presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWilliams, J. Brian Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 20, 2019 |
CategoryLetters Of Testamentary |
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationRockwall County, TX |
Matter TypeEstate Administration |
Filing Court HouseCounty Court at Law 1 |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 11, 2020 | Docket Event | Coordinator Status Check | |
May 09, 2020 | Docket Event | ORDER PROBATING WILL | |
May 06, 2020 | Docket Event | INVENTORY & APPRAISE | |
May 05, 2020 | Docket Event | PUBLISHERS AFFIDAVIT | |
March 10, 2020 | Docket Event | Affidavit | |
March 10, 2020 | Docket Event | PUBLISHERS AFFIDAVIT | |
January 09, 2020 | Docket Event | Prove Up | |
January 09, 2020 | Docket Event | Oath | |
January 09, 2020 | Docket Event | ORDER PROBATING WILL | |
January 09, 2020 | Docket Event | Proof of Death and Other Facts |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.