Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Brown, Charles W. filed a(n) Estate Administration - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Rockwall County, TX, . Rockwall County, TX Superior Courts County Court at Law 1 with Williams, J. Brian presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 21, 2015 |
CategoryDecedents' Estates: Independent Administration |
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationRockwall County, TX |
Matter TypeEstate Administration |
Filing Court HouseCounty Court at Law 1 |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 06, 2016 | Docket Event | Order | |
May 06, 2016 | Docket Event | DOCKET SHEET | |
May 06, 2016 | Docket Event | $DISP | |
May 03, 2016 | Docket Event | Inventory, Appraisement and List of Claims | |
April 25, 2016 | Docket Event | Affidavit | |
March 31, 2016 | Docket Event | PUBLISHERS AFFIDAVIT | |
January 04, 2016 | Docket Event | Probate Hearing | |
January 04, 2016 | Docket Event | Oath | |
January 04, 2016 | Docket Event | ORDER PROBATING WILL | |
January 04, 2016 | Docket Event | Proof of Death and Other Facts |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.