Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Brown, Lorenzo filed a(n) Estate Administration - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Rockwall County, TX, . Rockwall County, TX Superior Courts County Court at Law 1 with Williams, J. Brian presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 21, 2011 |
CategoryDecedents' Estates: Independent Administration |
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationRockwall County, TX |
Matter TypeEstate Administration |
Filing Court HouseCounty Court at Law 1 |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 24, 2012 | Docket Event | Order | |
April 20, 2012 | Docket Event | LETTER FROM ATTORNEY | |
April 20, 2012 | Docket Event | Inventory, Appraisement and List of Claims | |
April 19, 2012 | Docket Event | TPC 128A | |
April 19, 2012 | Docket Event | WAIVER | |
April 12, 2012 | Docket Event | CLAIM AGAINST ESTATE | |
January 11, 2012 | Docket Event | Oath | |
January 11, 2012 | Docket Event | Order | |
January 11, 2012 | Docket Event | Proof of Death and Other Facts | |
January 11, 2012 | Docket Event | $DISP |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.