Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Aldinger, A. Jared filed a(n) Estate Administration - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Rockwall County, TX, . Rockwall County, TX Superior Courts County Court at Law 1 with Williams, J. Brian presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWilliams, J. Brian Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 28, 2021 |
CategoryDecedents' Estates: Independent Administration |
Last RefreshedDecember 30, 2021 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationRockwall County, TX |
Matter TypeEstate Administration |
Filing Court HouseCounty Court at Law 1 |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 09, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice | |
July 28, 2021 | Docket Event | Order Approving Inventory | |
July 19, 2021 | Docket Event | INVENTORY & APPRAISE | |
July 14, 2021 | Docket Event | Prove Up | |
July 14, 2021 | Docket Event | Request | |
July 13, 2021 | Docket Event | Proof of Death and Other Facts | |
July 13, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER PROBATING WILL | |
July 13, 2021 | Docket Event | Oath | |
July 13, 2021 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT DECLARING HEIRSHIP | |
July 12, 2021 | Docket Event | Proof of Death and Other Facts |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.