Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Davis, Joyce filed a(n) Estate Administration - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Rockwall County, TX, . Rockwall County, TX Superior Courts County Court at Law 1 with Williams, J. Brian presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWilliams, J. Brian Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 17, 2021 |
CategoryLetters Of Testamentary |
Last RefreshedDecember 30, 2021 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationRockwall County, TX |
Matter TypeEstate Administration |
Filing Court HouseCounty Court at Law 1 |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 02, 2021 | Docket Event | Motion | |
September 20, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice | |
September 10, 2021 | Docket Event | Coordinator Status Check | |
September 01, 2021 | Docket Event | Letter | |
August 27, 2021 | Docket Event | Claim | |
July 29, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice | |
July 23, 2021 | Docket Event | Affidavit in Lieu of Inventory | |
June 30, 2021 | Docket Event | Motion | |
June 11, 2021 | Docket Event | Request | |
June 09, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER PROBATING WILL |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.