Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Huff, Jerry filed a(n) Estate Administration - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Rockwall County, TX, . Rockwall County, TX Superior Courts County Court at Law 1 with Rakow, David E presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 20, 2005 |
CategoryDecedents' Estates: Independent Administration |
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationRockwall County, TX |
Matter TypeEstate Administration |
Filing Court HouseCounty Court at Law 1 |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 13, 2007 | Docket Event | Order | |
February 20, 2007 | Docket Event | AMENDED INVENTORY APPRAISEMENT AND LIST OF CLAIMS | |
August 09, 2006 | Docket Event | Order | |
July 28, 2006 | Docket Event | Inventories Filed (OCA) | |
April 12, 2006 | Docket Event | APPLICATION EXTEND | |
February 02, 2006 | Docket Event | PUBLICATION | |
February 02, 2006 | Docket Event | Notice | |
January 09, 2006 | Docket Event | Oath | |
January 09, 2006 | Docket Event | PROOF OF FACT | |
January 09, 2006 | Docket Event | Order |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.