Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
State Of Texas filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Mcvay, Brandy Amber, in the jurisdiction of Rockwall County, TX, . Rockwall County, TX Superior Courts JP4 with Whitten, Liana presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 17, 2013 |
CategoryTraffic |
Last RefreshedDecember 31, 2021 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationRockwall County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Filing Court HouseJP4 |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 03, 2014 | Docket Event | CLOSED DATE | |
February 03, 2014 | Docket Event | came to docket | |
February 03, 2014 | Docket Event | Pre-Trial Hearing | |
January 28, 2014 | Docket Event | Complaint (OCA) | |
January 13, 2014 | Docket Event | COMMENT | |
January 13, 2014 | Docket Event | Pre-Trial Hearing | |
January 08, 2014 | Docket Event | COMMENT | |
December 17, 2013 | Docket Event | Case Filed |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.