Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Donna Fletcher D B A, Taylor Bail Bonds filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Smith, Kevin James, in the jurisdiction of Rockwall County, TX, . Rockwall County, TX Superior Courts JP3 with Russo, Mark presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 30, 2013 |
CategoryTraffic |
Last RefreshedDecember 31, 2021 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationRockwall County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Filing Court HouseJP3 |
Case Outcome TypePlea |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 18, 2017 | Docket Event | PAYMENT PLAN ESTABLISHED | |
April 18, 2017 | Docket Event | PENDING PAYMENT PLAN | |
April 17, 2017 | Docket Event | Show Cause Hearing (OCA) | |
April 17, 2017 | Docket Event | ADJUDICATED | |
September 26, 2016 | Docket Event | DEFERRED DISPOSITION | |
September 26, 2016 | Docket Event | BOND HEARING | |
August 10, 2016 | Docket Event | BOND POSTED | |
April 05, 2016 | Docket Event | Sent to OMNI | |
April 05, 2016 | Docket Event | COMMENT | |
February 24, 2014 | Docket Event | Warrant Issued |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.