Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
State Of Texas filed a(n) Failure To Appear case against Haynes, Alysia Raeanna, in the jurisdiction of Rockwall County, TX, . Rockwall County, TX Superior Courts JP2 with Beaty, Nancy presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 11, 2014 |
CategoryFailure To Appear |
Last RefreshedDecember 30, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationRockwall County, TX |
|
Filing Court HouseJP2 |
Case Outcome TypeDisposition |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 12, 2016 | Docket Event | BOND HEARING | |
July 12, 2016 | Docket Event | COMMENT | |
June 08, 2016 | Docket Event | BOND POSTED | |
February 05, 2016 | Docket Event | Sent to OMNI | |
February 05, 2016 | Docket Event | Warrant Issued | |
February 05, 2016 | Docket Event | $FTA | |
February 02, 2016 | Docket Event | Hearing | |
December 11, 2014 | Docket Event | Case Filed |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.