Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
State Of Texas filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Lee, Sarah Rayna, in the jurisdiction of Rockwall County, TX, . Rockwall County, TX Superior Courts JP2 with Holloway, Larry presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 21, 2009 |
CategoryTraffic |
Last RefreshedDecember 29, 2021 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationRockwall County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Filing Court HouseJP2 |
Case Outcome TypeDisposition |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 01, 2017 | Docket Event | Warrant Recalled | |
November 01, 2016 | Docket Event | APPEARANCE DOCKET | |
May 09, 2016 | Docket Event | Warrant Issued | |
March 08, 2016 | Docket Event | Hearing | |
January 14, 2015 | Docket Event | COMMENT | |
October 20, 2014 | Docket Event | post warrant letter returned | |
May 10, 2010 | Docket Event | Complaint (OCA) | |
April 20, 2010 | Docket Event | Complaint (OCA) | |
April 01, 2010 | Docket Event | Sent to OMNI | |
April 01, 2010 | Docket Event | $FTA |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.