Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Fernando Ortiz filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Ledet, Justin Paul, in the jurisdiction of Rockwall County, TX, . Rockwall County, TX Superior Courts JP1 with Karr, David presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 15, 2009 |
CategoryTraffic |
Last RefreshedDecember 31, 2021 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationRockwall County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Filing Court HouseJP1 |
Case Outcome TypePlea |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 26, 2010 | Docket Event | Pre-Trial Hearing | |
August 23, 2010 | Docket Event | COMMENT | |
August 19, 2010 | Docket Event | Cleared from OMNI | |
August 12, 2010 | Docket Event | COMMENT | |
July 19, 2010 | Docket Event | COMMENT | |
June 29, 2010 | Docket Event | Bond | |
March 16, 2010 | Docket Event | Sent to OMNI | |
March 05, 2010 | Docket Event | Complaint (OCA) | |
January 22, 2010 | Docket Event | Complaint (OCA) | |
December 15, 2009 | Docket Event | Case Filed |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.