Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Arthur Boulden filed a(n) case against Mathis, Tina Marie, in the jurisdiction of Rockwall County, TX, . Rockwall County, TX Superior Courts with Karr, David presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 28, 2005 |
|
Last RefreshedDecember 30, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationRockwall County, TX |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 08, 2007 | Docket Event | Cleared from OMNI | |
January 03, 2007 | Docket Event | COMMENT | |
November 15, 2006 | Docket Event | No Show for Pre-Trial | |
November 15, 2006 | Docket Event | Show Cause Hearing (OCA) | |
October 26, 2006 | Docket Event | COMMENT | |
October 25, 2006 | Docket Event | No Show for Pre-Trial | |
October 25, 2006 | Docket Event | Pre-Trial Hearing | |
August 23, 2006 | Docket Event | Sent to OMNI | |
August 07, 2006 | Docket Event | Complaint (OCA) | |
January 30, 2006 | Docket Event | COMMENT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.