Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
L'Marks Realty, filed a(n) General Small Claims - Small Claims case represented by Feldhendler, Leah, against Kirby, Bobby Ray, in the jurisdiction of Rockwall County, TX, . Rockwall County, TX Superior Courts JP1 with James, Jack presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 12, 2016 |
CategorySmall Claim |
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaSmall Claims |
Filing LocationRockwall County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Small Claims |
Filing Court HouseJP1 |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 24, 2018 | Docket Event | Hearing | |
March 16, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice by Mail returned | |
September 07, 2017 | Docket Event | AMENDMENT FILED | |
September 07, 2017 | Docket Event | Motion Filed | |
May 17, 2017 | Docket Event | PAPERS SERVED | |
May 01, 2017 | Docket Event | COMMENT | |
January 13, 2017 | Docket Event | ALTERNATE SERVICE | |
December 12, 2016 | Docket Event | Citation | |
December 12, 2016 | Docket Event | Original Petition (OCA) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.